Financial history NORTHERN LIGHTS METROPOLITAN COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1093009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £56.35k £29.65k £26.52k £26.13k £44.02k
Total expenditure £40.71k £24.40k £19.31k £33.62k £40.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k