THE BLOXHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1089485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £20.20k £16.85k £83.67k £7.00k £5.65k
Total expenditure £68.66k £65.24k £78.49k £77.05k £38.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A