Helping Hands at Beccles Primary Academy

Charity number: 1089621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/11/2016 28/11/2017 28/11/2018 28/11/2019 28/11/2020
Total gross income £7.53k £7.50k £3.24k £7.43k £3.40k
Total expenditure £6.25k £6.00k £6.67k £3.21k £3.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A