BIGGLESWADE ACADEMY PTFA

Charity number: 1089374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.91k £10.62k £9.59k £9.88k £6.68k
Total expenditure £11.73k £16.65k £6.03k £10.74k £3.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A