Accounts and annual returns ABERDEEN PARK NURSERY TRUST
Charity number: 1092460
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2007 | 16 November 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window