Financial history TONE DIVISION

Charity number: 1090391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £360 £101 £3.44k £1.55k £108
Total expenditure £291 £337 £3.06k £2.07k £285
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A