Trustees LLANFYLLIN DOLYDD BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 1091097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Llewelyn Hall | Chair | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John David Davies | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Oliver Warden | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Evans | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Christopher Tudor | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fionnula Mary Irwin | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Dolman | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Thomas John Eddy | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Kirk Henson | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alastair Cape QGM | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Izzi Zahorik | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN CAPE | Trustee | 15 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HAINSWORTH | Trustee | 15 April 2004 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DIX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.