Governing document EVERYCHILD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 18TH DECEMBER 2001, 23 OCTOBER 2006 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP POVERTY MALNUTRITION AND SICKNESS (WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL) OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES; AND 2. TO PROMOTE THE CARE DEVELOPMENT OR EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; IN BOTH CASES ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR RELIGION SEX OR RACE OR NATIONAL ORIGIN AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD (1959) AND TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND OBSERVANCE OF THAT CONVENTION AND DECLARATION AND 3. SUBJECT THERETO TO CARRY ON SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE CHARITY MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.