Trustees Winchester Philharmonic Choir
Charity number: 1095619
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Ryde-Weller | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Lovelace Rees | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Guy Collins | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Bate | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gabriele Karin McKeown | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Lowe | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Newman | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Ryde-Weller | Trustee | 24 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.