Financial history ACTION ON DISABILITY

Charity number: 1091518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.20m £1.11m £1.08m £949.17k £893.45k
Total expenditure £1.15m £1.12m £1.03m £880.55k £777.24k
Income from government contracts £640.63k £577.38k N/A £321.68k £317.32k
Income from government grants £63.00k £23.50k £491.84k £36.00k £27.58k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.94k £9.46k £7.58k £7.27k £4.62k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.20m £1.10m £1.08m £941.91k £887.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.75k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.08m £1.03m £866.52k £772.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £42.03k £34.33k £3.56k £14.03k £4.90k
Expenditure - Governance £1.38k £3.16k £0 £4.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.08m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0