Financial history SMETHWICK YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1090529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £430.82k £445.65k £493.20k £373.94k £396.44k
Total expenditure £459.24k £488.00k £533.80k £393.18k £483.35k
Income from government contracts £149.38k £129.46k £245.82k N/A £112.71k
Income from government grants N/A £41.58k N/A £21.00k £33.16k