Trustees Community Foundation for Staffordshire and Shropshire

Charity number: 1091628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sherrel Fikeis Trustee 30 April 2024
TELFORD AND THE WREKIN CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Received: On time
TELFORD AND THE WREKIN SENIOR CITIZENS FORUM
Received: On time
Andrew Halden Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Reena McCourt Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Antony Jones Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Alan William Durose Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
CHARLES JAMES BAGOT JEWITT Trustee 17 March 2022
ABBOTS BROMLEY HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Ashley Edward Brough Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Jeremy Lefroy Trustee 19 March 2020
STAFFORD WORKS
Received: On time
IVCC
Received: On time
Global Coalition for Youth Employment
Received: On time
THE TRAIDCRAFT FOUNDATION
Received: 99 days late
FRIENDS OF THE GUILDHALL, NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME
Received: On time
CAFE AFRICA TRUST
Received: On time
THE YARLET TRUST
Received: On time
THE DONALD MACKAY TRUST
Received: On time
THE MYCRO TRUST
Overdue by 104 days
THE BUCKE COLLINS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
TANZANIA DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE RELATIONSHIPS FOUNDATION
Received: 3 days late
STAFFORD AND DISTRICT CARERS HOLIDAY TRUST
Received: On time
CONCORDIS INTERNATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
STAFFORDSHIRE HISTORY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Judy Scott-Moncrieff Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
Charlotte Anne Almond Trustee 10 November 2016
None on record
TERRY WALSH Trustee 09 September 2015
None on record
Simon John Mason Price Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record