Financial history The Friends of Park Community Academy

Charity number: 1091560
Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.06k £6.08k £3.50k £50 £617
Total expenditure £605 £105 £578 £111 £116
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A