Trustees TETTENHALL WOOD SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1091299
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Whittington | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jon Hopkins | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Raven | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Callender | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Iqbal | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ward | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Atkins | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Williams | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.