Trustees THE BISHOPSGATE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1090923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Antony Pantling | Chair | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Smith | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard McDonald | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hingley | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abdullahi Bashe | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MOORE | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Francis Healy | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
The Revd David Thomas Armstrong | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Anna Cornelius | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Clatworthy | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Gibbons | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.