THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF ST. GREGORY AND ST. MARTIN AT WYE

Charity number: 1096801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £2.55k £16.43k £2.73k £1.43k £12
Total expenditure £1.23k £10.69k £1.53k £1.60k £1.31k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A