Governing document FRIENDS OF PEDAL POWER PROJECT LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 MAY 2002, 24 FEB 2004 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 NOVEMBER 2010. as amended on 03 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF BOTH DISABLED AND ABLE BODIED VISITORS TO AND INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF CARDIFF, VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND ENVIRONS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CYCLING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN CYCLING SAFETY.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF CITY OF CARDIFF, VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.