Trustees THE POLPERRO FISHERMENS CHOIR
Charity number: 1092351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Lionel Sainsbury | Chair | 22 February 2017 |
|
|||||
MARTIN KAY | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alfie Commander | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Smale | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Beswick | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PENGELLY | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT CARNELL | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN CRABB | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN WILTON | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Hall | Trustee | 17 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETE BREWER | Trustee | 15 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.