Financial history THE WILLOW ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE PROJECT

Charity number: 1094571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £25.43k £36.77k £28.11k £23.61k £21.70k
Total expenditure £23.37k £29.32k £30.11k £27.01k £19.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A