CARING TOGETHER CHARITY

Charity number: 1091522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 November 2016 On time Download