Governing document PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT ASSOCIATION (CENTRAL ENGLAND)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 2002, 27 JUNE 2002, 28 APRIL 2005, 24 APRIL 2008 AND 29 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
1) RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OR POVERTY OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER; 2) HELP AND SUPPORT PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER; 3) PROVIDE EDUCATION AND INFORMATION ABOUT PROSTATE CANCER TO PERSONS VULNERABLE TO AND WITH PROSTATE CANCER, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS VULNERABLE TO AND WITH PROSTATE CANCER, PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.