Trustees SOLIHULL CARERS CENTRE
Charity number: 1092613
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Heaselgrave | Chair | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Marie Beckett | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Loretta Paula James-Head | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Beer | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Elizabeth Price | Trustee | 20 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Grace | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SELINA WESTWOOD | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM THOMPSON | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|||||
MRS SUE JEYNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL SHIEL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.