Trustees 3RD WILNECOTE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1092030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Peter Wharmby | Chair | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Suter | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Ann Tatterton | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise Elston | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Young | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Leigh Jeffrey | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Elston | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr KAREN GREAVES | Trustee | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOAN GILLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE NICHOLLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON GILLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.