Trustees THE ST MARY WITH ST NICHOLAS PERIVALE MISSION FUND
Charity number: 1091859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daphne Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robert Handley | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sashiprabha Emmeline Balaguru | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Blackford | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Piesse | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Murphy | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nilesh Patel | Trustee | 03 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN BOAKYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROBIN WHITBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JEANETT GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.