FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, OVER

Charity number: 1092594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.77k £7.79k £7.50k £7.76k £9.98k
Total expenditure £440 £30.88k £880 £468 £1.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A