WASHINGTON ASYLUM SEEKERS PROJECT

Charity number: 1093416
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED ON 23 JULY 2002 AND 8 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
2.1 TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN THE TYNE AND WEAR AREA, WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 2.2 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. 2.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT OF LOCAL PEOPLE AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THEIR INCLUSION INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 14 August 2002 : registered
  • 04 December 2009 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (GI))
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body