THE ARABESQUE TRUST

Charity number: 1095040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £14.94k £16.05k £17.30k £18.12k £19.50k
Total expenditure £11.51k £8.23k £8.77k £9.19k £7.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A