Financial history YOUTH WITH A FUTURE

Charity number: 1094485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.37k £9.17k £3.64k £9.46k £3.77k
Total expenditure £6.87k £5.37k £11.01k £5.30k £10.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A