KENT REFUGEE ACTION NETWORK

Charity number: 1097886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £343.28k £398.48k £443.51k £387.24k £427.64k
Total expenditure £223.27k £365.34k £407.82k £419.48k £466.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £32.68k N/A £14.58k £60.49k
Income from government grants £75.00k £75.00k £8.50k £12.00k N/A