Trustees PRESTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1092415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Marie Rose | Chair | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faye Foster | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jetta Sneddon | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Swash | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Sanderson | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Autumn Strike | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Chinaka | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Richardson | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Lawson | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALLRED | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN CLIFT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.