NINE THIRTY EIGHT 9:38

Charity number: 1092881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £44.41k £46.54k £71.89k £60.58k £46.49k
Total expenditure £41.26k £36.11k £41.88k £55.35k £60.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A