ANIMAL RESCUE CYPRUS (ARC)

Charity number: 1096482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £36.03k £50.19k £34.83k £32.66k £40.83k
Total expenditure £41.17k £71.51k £24.85k £54.28k £32.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A