Trustees GRANDPARENTS PLUS
Charity number: 1093975
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayne Harrill | Chair | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Rose Barnett-Jones | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Jane Boughton | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Miles Corry-Roake | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Sharp-Jeffs | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Kay | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Stanley | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Baker | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Baldry | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Julian Arthur Young | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Farmer | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.