Financial history HEICHAL HATORAH

Charity number: 1095687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £318.71k £618.19k £469.53k £602.35k £743.38k
Total expenditure £385.40k £411.93k £457.73k £402.15k £517.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £220.73k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £608.09k N/A £602.35k £876.72k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £10.11k N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £3
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £876.72k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £306.65k N/A £0 £491.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £24.65k N/A £402.15k £25.66k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.03k N/A £0 £398.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £58.20k N/A £0 £93.01k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £4.77k N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £80.64k N/A £0 £0