ST PETER'S STAPENHILL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1093235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.91k £13.66k £7.52k £6.34k £6.92k
Total expenditure £9.05k £4.20k £500 £11.98k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A