BLUECOAT SPORTS

Charity number: 1096244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.81m £1.92m £2.03m £1.99m £1.57m
Total expenditure £1.52m £2.40m £2.08m £2.05m £1.81m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £222.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £222.14k
Income - Other trading activities £12.15k £12.45k £11.02k £12.35k £7.91k
Income - Charitable activities £1.79m £1.90m £2.02m £1.97m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.25k £6.74k £3.20k £12.69k £2.79k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.49m £2.36m £2.08m £2.05m £1.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.75k £34.81k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.42k £6.96k £6.60k £10.83k £9.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0