AL-ANSAAR WELFARE & EDUCATION

Charity number: 1100482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £189.17k £179.01k £178.30k £187.09k £152.06k
Total expenditure £175.39k £161.63k £194.56k £181.89k £169.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A