Governing document One Housing Foundation
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/04/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/04/2012 as amended on 20 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE HOMELESS AND AMONGST THOSE IN NEED; 2. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 4. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 5. THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES OR EDUCATIONAL, LEISURE, SPORTS AND ARTS AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; AND 6. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.