Financial history "IF..."

Charity number: 1095626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £226.18k £1.41m £1.22m £2.20m £4.11m
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.34m £1.43m £1.66m £3.37m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.40m £1.21m £2.20m £4.05m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £7.12k £4.82k £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £59.04k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.31m £1.40m £1.62m £3.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £31.96k £31.51k £35.78k £239.93k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £28.87k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0