Financial history ST MARTIN'S CENTRE FOR HEALTH AND HEALING

Charity number: 1094458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £245.96k £210.60k £288.15k £404.90k £510.67k
Total expenditure £189.69k £193.23k £255.50k £280.97k £395.62k
Income from government contracts £22.19k £78.88k £83.38k £277.87k £22.89k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.85k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £489.35k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.45k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £15
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £395.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £54
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0