Trustees LINCOLN COLLEGE OXFORD
Charity number: 1139261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR HENRY RUXTON WOUDHUYSEN | Chair | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr PETER SARKIES | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr CHRISTOPHE SCHMITT-MAASS | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr JOSHUA BENNET | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr KIMBERELY PALLADINO | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
GABRIELLE WATSON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JONG PHIL PARK | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
HARRIOT SOPER | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
LYDIA MATTHEWS | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr JODY LAPORTE | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ALEXANDER PRESCOTT-COUCH | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREAS TELEVANTOS | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr MATTHEW MOORE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr LUCY WOODING | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR PEDRO CARVALHO | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ALEX DOMINIC SPAIN | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr PAUL NICHOLAS STAVRINOU | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Aleksei Parakhonyak | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr DANIELA OMLOR | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR MATTHEW FREEMAN | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR STEFAN ENCHELMAIER | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|||||||
Dr TIMOTHY MICHAEL | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr QIAN WANG | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN ROSEMARY HARRISON | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr DOMINIC JOSEPH ROBERT VELLA | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
JORDAN RAFF | Trustee | 01 October 2010 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR MARGARET JANE STEVENS | Trustee | 01 January 2002 |
|
|||||||
Dr MARIA STAMATOPOULOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr MICHAEL WILLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR ROLAND SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr NIGEL EMPTAGE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr RADU COLDEA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr EDWARD NYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr PETER MCCULLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR DAVID ANTHONY HILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr PEREGRINE LEE GAUCI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr DAVID VAUX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.