Trustees THE ST CUTHBERT'S TRUST PORTSMOUTH

Charity number: 1102652
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Denise Rose Edith Minter Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Rev Alison Mary Kerr Trustee 17 July 2019
None on record
BEATRICE MARY BISH Trustee 12 October 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF COPNOR, PORTSMOUTH
Received: On time
DEBRA WARD Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
ANNE GARD Trustee 08 March 2015
None on record
JOHN ENGLAND Trustee 09 October 2014
None on record
MALCOLM CLUBLEY Trustee 13 June 2013
None on record
Sally Harry Trustee 26 July 2011
None on record
SUSAN BERYL WALKER Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF COPNOR, PORTSMOUTH
Received: On time