Financial history BRITISH FRIENDS OF CAMPOS

Charity number: 1095044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.62k £1.54k £1.38k £1.09k £1.18k
Total expenditure £743 £4.58k £520 £2.03k £1.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A