SOUTHAMPTON FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 1095732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £40.05k £44.48k £48.20k £46.94k £53.20k
Total expenditure £40.98k £40.87k £47.46k £45.12k £42.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A