FRIENDS OF STANTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1094763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £7.40k £4.46k £7.28k £2.88k £731
Total expenditure £9.24k £1.98k £10.66k £1.94k £2.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A