Financial history NORWICH INTERNATIONAL YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1099039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £20.47k £38.37k £33.80k £50.00k £57.34k
Total expenditure £24.99k £31.80k £33.73k £33.81k £41.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A