Trustees UKCISA
Charity number: 1095294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Koen Lamberts | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Barnes | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adityavarman Mehta | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Adams | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Loray | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Turhan | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hamish Walker | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Gwynett-Davies | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Saca | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ross Clive Porter | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Brian | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr NORA HENRIETTE DE LEEUW | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Rose-Troup | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Bendon | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Huckle | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Semple Proudfoot | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.