Governing document Eleni
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/08/2013 as amended on 13 Dec 2019 as amended on 01 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ART, PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF DANCE WITHIN NORTH EAST WALES
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.