Accounts and annual returns ARMS OF LOVE UK

Charity number: 1099034
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 July 2021 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 25 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required