THE GREAT MEETING HOUSE UNITARIAN CHURCH COVENTRY

Charity number: 1095136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.18k £7.78k £8.35k £8.12k £7.29k
Total expenditure £8.21k £7.40k £7.48k £7.72k £7.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A